WV SB370 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - To House Banking and Insurance
Pending: House Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - To House Banking and Insurance
Pending: House Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting nonpaid volunteers at ski areas from workers compensation benefits
Title
Exempting nonpaid volunteers at ski areas from workers' compensation benefits
Sponsors
Sen. Sue Cline [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 126) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-16 | House | To House Banking and Insurance |
2018-02-16 | House | To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary |
2018-02-16 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 126) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-15 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-14 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-02-13 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2018-02-06 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2018-01-25 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-01-25 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | 2 | 1a | Amended Code | Citation Text |