WV SB369 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 35, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 35, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide full faith and credit to a nonresident who has a permit or license to carry a handgun in his or her state when that state allows residents of West Virginia who are licensed in West Virginia to carry a concealed deadly weapon to carry a concealed deadly weapon in that other state.
Title
Relating to concealed handgun license reciprocity
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-13 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 70) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 316) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 8) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 316) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 8) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | Senate | Chapter 35, Acts, Regular Session, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | House | Approved by Governor 5/1/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 5/1/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Approved by Governor 5/1/13 |
2013-04-17 | House | To Governor 5/1/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | To Governor 5/1/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-05-01 | Senate | To Governor 5/1/13 |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 70) |
2013-04-13 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-12 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2013-04-12 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 316) |
2013-04-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-12 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-11 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2013-04-11 | House | Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Voice vote) |
2013-04-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-11 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-10 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-04-10 | House | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2013-04-09 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2013-04-02 | House | To House Judiciary |
2013-04-02 | House | To Judiciary |
2013-04-02 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 8) |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-01 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-03-29 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-03-28 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2013-02-26 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-02-26 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2602 (Similar To) 2013-02-22 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 7 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 7 | 6a | Amended Code | Citation Text |