WV SB36 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 76, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 76, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting school nurses to possess and administer opioid antagonists
Title
Permitting school nurses to possess and administer opioid antagonists
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. Ed Gaunch [R] | Sen. Richard Ojeda [D] | Sen. Douglas Facemire [D] |
Sen. Glenn Jeffries [D] | Sen. Robert Beach [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 308) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 274) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 152) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 274) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 152) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Senate | Chapter 76, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/11/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/11/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/11/17 |
2017-04-07 | House | To Governor 4/6/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-06 | Senate | To Governor 4/6/17 |
2017-04-01 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-01 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-01 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2017-04-01 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 308) |
2017-04-01 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-03-31 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-03-31 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 274) |
2017-03-31 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-31 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-30 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-03-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-30 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-29 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-29 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-28 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2017-03-22 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2017-03-22 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2017-03-22 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 152) |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-21 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-20 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-03-18 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-03-18 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2017-02-08 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-02-08 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 46 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 5 | 22d | New Code | See Bill Text |