WV SB359 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Chapter 267, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Chapter 267, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Informing landowners when fencing that may contain livestock is damaged due to accident
Title
Informing landowners when fencing that may contain livestock is damaged due to accident
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. Jack Woodrum [R] | Sen. Eric Nelson [R] |
Sen. Stephen Baldwin [D] | Sen. Rollan Roberts [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 541) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 331) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 429) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 62) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 331) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 429) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 62) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Senate | Chapter 267, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-04-10 | House | Approved by Governor 4/21/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/21/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/21/21 |
2021-04-10 | House | To Governor 4/16/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | To Governor 4/16/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-16 | Senate | To Governor 4/16/21 |
2021-04-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-04-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2021-04-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-04-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 541) |
2021-04-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 331) |
2021-04-06 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-04-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-04-05 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-04-05 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 429) |
2021-04-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-05 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-04-05 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2021-04-05 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-04-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-02 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-04-01 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-04-01 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-31 | House | Do pass |
2021-03-25 | House | To House Judiciary |
2021-03-25 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2021-03-03 | House | To House Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2021-03-03 | House | To Agriculture and Natural Resources then Judiciary |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 62) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-02 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-02-26 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2021-02-18 | Senate | To Agriculture and Rural Development |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-02-18 | Senate | To Agriculture and Rural Development |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Filed for introduction |