WV SB359 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-29 - To Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-29 - To Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to expand the number of people who are trained in suicide prevention in order to maximize the possibility that at risk children and adults can be saved. School personnel from middle school through college will not only be trained, they will provide children and young adults with suicide prevention information, facilitate discussion about preventing suicide and make mental health resources available. Licensed medical professionals will be required to obtain education in suicide prevention as part of their licensing process.
Title
Relating to suicide prevention awareness
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 187) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 2) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 2) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-29 | Senate | To Education |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-01-29 | Senate | To Education then Finance |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2535 (Same As) 2015-04-15 - Chapter 225, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
HB2441 (Same As) 2015-02-10 - To House Judiciary
HB2441 (Same As) 2015-02-10 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 40 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 5 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 5 | 19d | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 1B | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 6 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 6 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 1 | 7a | Amended Code | Citation Text |