WV SB357 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 226, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating generally to Division of Administrative Services

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating generally to Division of Administrative Services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 522) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 69) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateChapter 226, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-03-09HouseApproved by Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateApproved by Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-22SenateApproved by Governor 3/22/19
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-22SenateTo Governor 3/22/19
2019-03-08SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-07HouseCompleted legislative action
2019-03-07HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-07HousePassed House (Roll No. 522)
2019-03-07HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-07HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-06HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-06HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-05HouseRead 1st time
2019-03-05HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-04HouseDo pass
2019-02-05HouseTo House Government Organization
2019-02-05HouseTo Government Organization
2019-02-05HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-04SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-04SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 69)
2019-02-04SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-04SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-01SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-01SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-01-31SenateRead 1st time
2019-01-31SenateOn 1st reading
2019-01-30SenateCommittee substitute reported
2019-01-21SenateTo Government Organization
2019-01-21SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-21SenateTo Government Organization
2019-01-21SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
159A1Repealed CodeCitation Text
159A2Repealed CodeCitation Text
159A3Repealed CodeCitation Text
159A4Repealed CodeCitation Text
15A21Amended CodeCitation Text
15A23Amended CodeCitation Text
15A24New CodeSee Bill Text
15A25New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback