WV SB356 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 225, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation to release certain information to county prosecutors and US Attorney

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring MAPS provide state and federal prosecutors information

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 220) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 100) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateChapter 225, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-03-08HouseApproved by Governor 3/7/19 - House Journal
2019-03-07SenateApproved by Governor 3/7/19
2019-03-01HouseTo Governor 3/1/19 - House Journal
2019-03-01SenateTo Governor 3/1/19
2019-02-22SenateHouse Message received
2019-02-21HouseCompleted legislative action
2019-02-21HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-02-21HousePassed House (Roll No. 220)
2019-02-21HouseRead 3rd time
2019-02-21HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-20HouseRead 2nd time
2019-02-20HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-19HouseRead 1st time
2019-02-19HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-18HouseDo pass
2019-02-11HouseTo House Judiciary
2019-02-11HouseTo Judiciary
2019-02-11HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-08SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-08SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 100)
2019-02-08SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-08SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-07SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-07SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-06SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-06SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-05SenateCommittee substitute reported
2019-01-21SenateTo Judiciary
2019-01-21SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-21SenateTo Judiciary
2019-01-21SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2698 (Similar To) 2019-02-15 - To House Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15A17New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback