WV SB354 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to direct the Commissioner of Highways to conduct a study on alternative revenue mechanisms for development and maintenance of state roads and highways.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring study on alternative revenue sources for funding state roads

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 7) (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-08HouseTo House Finance
2013-04-08HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Finance
2013-04-02HouseTo House Roads and Transportation
2013-04-02HouseTo Roads and Transportation then Finance
2013-04-02HouseIntroduced in House
2013-04-01SenateOrdered to House
2013-04-01SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 7)
2013-04-01SenateRead 3rd time
2013-04-01SenateOn 3rd reading
2013-03-29SenateCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2013-03-29SenateRead 2nd time
2013-03-29SenateOn 2nd reading
2013-03-28SenateRead 1st time
2013-03-28SenateOn 1st reading
2013-03-27SenateReported do pass, with amendment
2013-03-26SenateReferred to Finance
2013-03-26SenateMotion
2013-03-26SenateReported do pass, but first to Finance
2013-02-22SenateTo Transportation and Infrastructure
2013-02-22SenateIntroduced in Senate
2013-02-22SenateTo Transportation and Infrastructure
2013-02-22SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
172A8dNew CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback