WV SB353 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-22 - On 2nd reading to Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Increasing salaries of magistrates, supreme court justices, circuit court judges and family court judges

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increasing salaries of magistrates, supreme court justices, circuit court judges and family court judges

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-22SenateOn 2nd reading to Finance
2019-02-22SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-22SenateImmediate consideration
2019-02-22SenateReported do pass, but first to Finance
2019-01-18SenateTo Judiciary
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-18SenateTo Judiciary then Finance
2019-01-18SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2197 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - To House Judiciary
HB2864 (Similar To) 2019-02-21 - To House Finance

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5013Amended CodeCitation Text
51110aAmended CodeCitation Text
51213Amended CodeCitation Text
512A6Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback