WV SB348 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - To House Health and Human Resources
Pending: House Health & Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - To House Health and Human Resources
Pending: House Health & Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to tobacco usage restrictions
Title
Relating to tobacco usage restrictions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 264) (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Floor amendment adopted (Roll No. 259) (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Floor amendment adopted (Roll No. 259) (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2019-02-28 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 264) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-27 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Roll No. 259) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-25 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported |
2019-02-13 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Motion to dispense with second reference rejected |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary |
2019-01-18 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-18 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB81 (Similar To) 2019-01-31 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 9A | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 9A | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 9A | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 9A | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 9A | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 9A | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 9A | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 9A | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 9A | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 9A | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |