WV SB347 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Vetoed on March 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-18 - Vetoed by Governor 3/20/15 - Senate Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-18 - Vetoed by Governor 3/20/15 - Senate Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to create the West Virginia Firearms Act of 2015. The bill repeals the exceptions section of the code to prohibitions against carrying concealed handguns and exemptions from licensing fees. It authorizes carrying a handgun for purposes of self-defense while in the woods of this state whether the handgun is concealed or not. The bill provides that if the findings of fact and conclusions of law of the court fail to uphold a denial of a license, the applicant is entitled to reasonable costs and attorney's fees, payable by the sheriff's office which issued the denial. The bill amends the provision relation to who is prohibited from possessing firearms under section seven of this article, maintains the penalty provisions. It sets out the procedure for the sheriff in determining eligibility for license when license holder changes home county. The bill amends the language relating to the right of certain persons to limit possession of firearms on premises and private real property.
Title
Creating Firearms Act of 2015
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] | Sen. Robert Beach [D] | Sen. Craig Blair [R] | Sen. Ed Gaunch [R] |
Sen. Daniel Hall [D] | Sen. Robert Karnes [R] | Sen. Kent Leonhardt [R] | Sen. Mark Maynard [R] |
Sen. Bob Williams [D] | Sen. Ryan Ferns [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-13 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 34) (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 466) (Y: 71 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - Committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 442) (Y: 76 N: 17 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 441) (Y: 23 N: 70 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-11 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 440) (Y: 7 N: 86 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-11 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 439) (Y: 23 N: 69 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-11 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 438) (Y: 17 N: 74 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 6) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - Romano Floor amendment 3 rejected (Roll No. 5) (Y: 4 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-27 - Senate - Romano Floor amendment 1 rejected (Roll No. 4) (Y: 4 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 466) (Y: 71 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - Committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 442) (Y: 76 N: 17 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 441) (Y: 23 N: 70 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-11 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 440) (Y: 7 N: 86 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-11 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 439) (Y: 23 N: 69 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-11 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 438) (Y: 17 N: 74 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 6) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - Romano Floor amendment 3 rejected (Roll No. 5) (Y: 4 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-27 - Senate - Romano Floor amendment 1 rejected (Roll No. 4) (Y: 4 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-18 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 3/20/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 3/20/15 |
2015-03-18 | House | Vetoed by Governor 3/20/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | House | To Governor 3/18/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | Senate | To Governor 3/18/15 |
2015-03-14 | House | House received Senate message |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 34) |
2015-03-13 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-12 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-03-12 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 466) |
2015-03-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-12 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-11 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-03-11 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 442) |
2015-03-11 | House | Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 441) |
2015-03-11 | House | Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 440) |
2015-03-11 | House | Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 439) |
2015-03-11 | House | Amendment withdrawn (Voice vote) |
2015-03-11 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2015-03-11 | House | Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 438) |
2015-03-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-11 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-10 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-03-10 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-09 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2015-02-27 | House | To House Judiciary |
2015-02-27 | House | To Judiciary |
2015-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 6) |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Romano Floor amendment 3 rejected (Roll No. 5) |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Romano Floor amendment 2 rejected (Voice vote) |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Romano Floor amendment 1 rejected (Roll No. 4) |
2015-02-27 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-26 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-02-25 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2015-01-28 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-01-28 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2 | 6a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 7 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 7 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 7 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 7 | 6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
61 | 7 | 7a | New Code | See Bill Text |