WV SB346 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Chapter 182, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Chapter 182, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing DMV use electronic means when providing notice for licensees and vehicle owners
Title
Authorizing DMV use electronic means when providing notice for licensees and vehicle owners
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Weld [R] | Sen. Randy Smith [R] | Sen. William Ihlenfeld [D] | Sen. Eric Nelson [R] |
Sen. Glenn Jeffries [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 405) (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 122) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 122) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Senate | Chapter 182, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-04-10 | House | Approved by Governor 4/15/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/15/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/15/21 |
2021-04-06 | House | To Governor 4/6/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-06 | Senate | To Governor 4/6/21 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-04-02 | House | Completed legislative action |
2021-04-02 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-04-02 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 405) |
2021-04-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-02 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-04-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-01 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-31 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-31 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-30 | House | 2nd reference dispensed |
2021-03-30 | House | Do pass |
2021-03-16 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2021-03-16 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure then Government Organization |
2021-03-16 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 122) |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-15 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-12 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-03-11 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2021-02-18 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-02-18 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17A | 2 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |