WV SB345 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 222, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 222, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Adding definition of "grantee" to include state spending units and local governments
Title
Relating to fire service equipment and training funds for VFDs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 523) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 592) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 130) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 592) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 130) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 222, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/20/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/20/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-20 | Senate | To Governor 3/20/19 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 523) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-08 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 592) |
2019-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-03-06 | House | Immediate consideration |
2019-03-06 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2019-02-27 | House | To House Finance |
2019-02-27 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2019-02-14 | House | To House Fire Departments and Emergency Medical Services |
2019-02-14 | House | To Fire Departments and Emergency Medical Services then Finance |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 130) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-13 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-12 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-11 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2019-01-18 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-18 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2558 (Similar To) 2019-01-21 - To House Government Organization
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 4 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
12 | 4 | 14b | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 3 | 5f | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 3 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 15 | 8b | Amended Code | Citation Text |