WV SB344 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Chapter 249, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to credit for qualified rehabilitated buildings investment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to credit for qualified rehabilitated buildings investment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-10 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2021 (Roll No. 462) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 462) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - Effective July 1, 2021 (Roll No. 606) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 605) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2021 (Roll No. 100) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 100) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-24SenateChapter 249, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
2021-04-10HouseApproved by Governor 4/21/21 - House Journal
2021-04-10SenateApproved by Governor 4/21/21 - Senate Journal
2021-04-21SenateApproved by Governor 4/21/21
2021-04-10HouseTo Governor 4/16/21 - House Journal
2021-04-10SenateTo Governor 4/16/21 - Senate Journal
2021-04-16SenateTo Governor 4/16/21
2021-04-10SenateCompleted legislative action
2021-04-10SenateCommunicated to House
2021-04-10SenateEffective July 1, 2021 (Roll No. 462)
2021-04-10SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 462)
2021-04-10SenateHouse Message received
2021-04-10HouseCommunicated to Senate
2021-04-10HouseEffective July 1, 2021 (Roll No. 606)
2021-04-10HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2021-04-10HousePassed House (Roll No. 605)
2021-04-10HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-10HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2021-04-09HouseCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2021-04-09HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-09HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2021-04-08HouseRead 1st time
2021-04-08HouseImmediate consideration
2021-04-08HouseWith amendment, do pass
2021-03-10HouseTo House Finance
2021-03-10HouseTo Finance
2021-03-10HouseIntroduced in House
2021-03-09SenateOrdered to House
2021-03-09SenateEffective July 1, 2021 (Roll No. 100)
2021-03-09SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 100)
2021-03-09SenateRead 3rd time
2021-03-09SenateOn 3rd reading
2021-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2021-03-08SenateOn 2nd reading
2021-03-05SenateRead 1st time
2021-03-05SenateOn 1st reading
2021-03-04SenateCommittee substitute reported
2021-02-18SenateTo Finance
2021-02-18SenateIntroduced in Senate
2021-02-18SenateTo Finance
2021-02-18SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11218aAmended CodeCitation Text
112423aAmended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=344&year=2021&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB344%20INTR.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=344
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB344%20SUB1.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=344
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB344%20SUB1%20enr.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=344
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/com_amends/SB344%20H%20FIN%20AM%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/com_amends/SB344%20H%20FIN%20AMT.htm
Supplementhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Fiscalnotes/FN(2)/fnsubmit_recordview1.cfm?RecordID=798643209
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/senate/03-09-0100.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/house/00605.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/house/00606.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/senate/04-10-0462.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback