WV SB344 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 6, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to operation of state-owned farms

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to operation of state-owned farms

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 456) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 455) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 185) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 185) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateChapter 6, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-03-09HouseApproved by Governor 3/26/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateApproved by Governor 3/26/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-26SenateApproved by Governor 3/26/19
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/19/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/19/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-19SenateTo Governor 3/19/19
2019-03-06SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-05HouseCompleted legislative action
2019-03-05HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-05HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 456)
2019-03-05HousePassed House (Roll No. 455)
2019-03-05HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-05HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-04HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-04HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-02HouseRead 1st time
2019-03-02HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-01HouseDo pass
2019-02-27HouseTo House Government Organization
2019-02-27HouseDo pass, but first to Government Organization
2019-02-21HouseTo House Agriculture and Natural Resources
2019-02-21HouseTo Agriculture and Natural Resources then Government Organization
2019-02-21HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-21SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-21SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 185)
2019-02-21SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 185)
2019-02-21SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-20SenateLaid over on 3rd reading 2/20/19
2019-02-20SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-20SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-19SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-19SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-18SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-18SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-15SenateCommittee substitute reported
2019-01-18SenateTo Agriculture and Rural Development
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-18SenateTo Agriculture and Rural Development
2019-01-18SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2560 (Similar To) 2019-01-21 - To House Agriculture and Natural Resources

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1912A1Amended CodeCitation Text
1912A2Amended CodeCitation Text
1912A3Repealed CodeCitation Text
1912A4Repealed CodeCitation Text
1912A5Amended CodeCitation Text
1912A6Amended CodeCitation Text
1912A6aAmended CodeCitation Text
1912A7Repealed CodeCitation Text
1912A8Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback