WV SB344 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-01 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-01 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifying composition and chairmanship of Commission on Special Investigations
Title
Clarifying composition and chairmanship of Commission on Special Investigations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 218) (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 218) (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 218) (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | House | To House Judiciary |
2016-03-01 | House | To Judiciary |
2016-03-01 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 218) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 218) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-28 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 2/28/16 |
2016-02-27 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 2/27/16 |
2016-02-27 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-26 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-02-25 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2016-01-21 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-01-21 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4302 (Similar To) 2016-01-27 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
4 | 5 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
4 | 5 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
4 | 5 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
4 | 5 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
4 | 5 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
4 | 5 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
4 | 5 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |