WV SB343 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-14 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-14 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to remove chiropractic physicians from the list of medical professionals required to perform continuing education in the area of mental health conditions common to veterans and family members of veterans.
Title
Exempting chiropractors from continuing education requirement on mental health conditions common to veterans
Sponsors
Sen. Craig Blair [R] | Sen. Herb Snyder [D] | Sen. David Nohe [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-20 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 19) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 19) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 18) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 19) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 18) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-14 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on House Calender |
2015-03-04 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-03 | House | Laid over on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 3/4/15 |
2015-03-03 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-02 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-03-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-02 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-28 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-02-28 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-27 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2015-02-20 | House | To House Government Organization |
2015-02-20 | House | To Government Organization |
2015-02-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 19) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 19) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 18) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-20 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-02-19 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2015-02-06 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary |
2015-01-28 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-01-28 | Senate | To Government Organization then Judiciary |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 1 | 7a | Amended Code | Citation Text |