WV SB342 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 207, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 207, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to clarify the scope, application and methods for error correction required by the CPR as it relates to PER, DRS, MPFRS, TRS, TDC Plan, State Police (Plan A), State Police (Plan B) and JRS.
Title
Clarifying scope, application and requirements for error corrections by CPRB
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 465) (Y: 84 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Senate | Chapter 207, Acts, Regular Session, 2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Approved by Governor 3/24/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/24/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/24/15 |
2015-03-18 | House | To Governor 3/18/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | Senate | To Governor 3/18/15 |
2015-03-13 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-12 | House | Completed legislative action |
2015-03-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-12 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 465) |
2015-03-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-12 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-11 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-10 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-03-10 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-09 | House | Do pass |
2015-03-02 | House | To House Finance |
2015-03-02 | House | To Finance |
2015-03-02 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-03-01 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2015-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) |
2015-03-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-01 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2015-02-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-28 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-02-27 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2015-02-19 | Senate | To Finance |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2015-01-28 | Senate | To Pensions |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-01-28 | Senate | To Pensions then Finance |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2521 (Same As) 2015-03-04 - To Pensions
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 54 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 2A | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 5V | 8a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 7A | 14c | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 7B | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 10 | 44 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 9 | 18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
7 | 14D | 7a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 22A | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 22A | 8a | New Code | See Bill Text |