WV SB341 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creating new court of WV Intermediate Court of Appeals
Title
Relating generally to WV Appellate Reorganization Act of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 122) (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-16 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-02-16 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2018-02-16 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 122) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-15 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-14 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-02-13 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported |
2018-02-02 | Senate | To Finance |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2018-01-23 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-01-23 | Senate | To Judiciary then Finance |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | 5 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
23 | 5 | 11a | New Code | See Bill Text |
29A | 5 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29A | 6 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 1 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 10 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 10 | 3a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 4A | 11a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 5 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 5 | 6e | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 5 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 11 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 11 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 11 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 11 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 11 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 11 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 11 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 11 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 11 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 11 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 11 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 11 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 11 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 11 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 1B | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 1B | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 1B | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 1B | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 1B | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 1B | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 1B | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 1B | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 1B | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 1B | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 1B | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 1B | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 2A | 24 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 9 | 1a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
58 | 5 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
6 | 5 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |