WV SB341 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to establish a West Virginia business growth in low-income communities tax credit.
Title
Establishing WV business growth in low-income communities tax credit
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Ferns [R] | Sen. Corey Palumbo [D] | Sen. Robert Plymale [D] | Sen. Jeffrey Mullins [R] |
Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. Tom Takubo [R] | Sen. Sue Cline [R] | Sen. Michael Maroney [R] |
Sen. John Unger [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 155) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | House | To House Finance |
2017-03-30 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2017-03-22 | House | To House Small Business, Entrepreneurship and Economic Development |
2017-03-22 | House | To Small Business, Entrepreneurship and Economic Development then Finance |
2017-03-22 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 155) |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-21 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-20 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-03-18 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-03-18 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported |
2017-02-23 | Senate | To Finance |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2017-02-17 | Senate | To Economic Development |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-02-17 | Senate | To Economic Development then Finance |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 13DD | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13DD | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13DD | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13DD | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13DD | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13DD | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13DD | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13DD | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13DD | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13DD | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 15D | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 15D | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 15D | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 15D | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 15D | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 15D | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 3 | 14e | New Code | See Bill Text |