WV SB339 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Allowing certain persons carry pepper spray in State Capitol Complex

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing certain persons carry pepper spray in State Capitol Complex

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 136) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 136) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15HouseTo House Judiciary
2019-02-15HouseTo Judiciary
2019-02-15HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-14SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-14SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 136)
2019-02-14SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 136)
2019-02-14SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-14SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-13SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-13SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-12SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-12SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-11SenateCommittee substitute reported
2019-01-17SenateTo Judiciary
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-17SenateTo Judiciary
2019-01-17SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB338 (Similar To) 2019-01-17 - To Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
61619Amended CodeCitation Text
61619aNew CodeSee Bill Text
6172Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback