WV SB335 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing certain municipalities regulate taxis and taxi stands
Title
Authorizing certain municipalities regulate taxis and taxi stands by ordinance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-12 - House - Passage (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-10 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-04 | Chapter 122, Acts, Regular Session, 2011 | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 3/31/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 3/31/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-31 | Approved by Governor 3/31/11 | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/24/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-24 | To Governor 3/24/11 | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/24/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-12 | House received Senate message | |
2011-03-12 | Completed legislative action | |
2011-03-12 | Communicated to House | |
2011-03-12 | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 44) | |
2011-03-12 | House Message received | |
2011-03-12 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-03-12 | Passed House (Roll No. 357) | |
2011-03-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-12 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-03-11 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-11 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-11 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-03-10 | Read 1st time | |
2011-03-10 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2011-03-09 | With amendment, do pass | |
2011-03-04 | To House Judiciary | |
2011-03-04 | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary | |
2011-02-22 | To House Political Subdivisions | |
2011-02-22 | To Political Subdivisions then Judiciary | |
2011-02-22 | Introduced in House | |
2011-02-21 | Ordered to House | |
2011-02-21 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) | |
2011-02-21 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-02-21 | On 3rd reading | |
2011-02-18 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-02-18 | On 2nd reading | |
2011-02-17 | Read 1st time | |
2011-02-17 | On 1st reading | |
2011-02-16 | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported | |
2011-02-03 | To Judiciary | |
2011-02-03 | Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary | |
2011-01-28 | To Government Organization | |
2011-01-28 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-01-28 | To Government Organization then Judiciary | |
2011-01-28 | Filed for introduction |