WV SB329 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - Referred to Rules on 3rd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - Referred to Rules on 3rd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
DEP rule relating to ambient air quality standards
Title
Authorizing DEP promulgate legislative rules
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Rules on 3rd reading |
2020-02-26 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2020-01-14 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-14 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4217 (Similar To) 2020-04-15 - Chapter 211, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
64 | 3 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
64 | 3 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |