WV SB324 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 5, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 5, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to Commissioner of Agriculture employees
Title
Relating to Commissioner of Agriculture employees
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] | Sen. Robert Beach [D] | Sen. Patricia Rucker [R] | Sen. Randy Smith [R] |
Sen. Ryan Weld [R] | Sen. Gregory Boso [R] | Sen. Sue Cline [R] | Sen. Charles Clements [R] |
Sen. Eric Tarr [R] | Sen. Bill Hamilton [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-07 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 90) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 89) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 68) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 68) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 89) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 68) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 68) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 5, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | House | Approved by Governor 2/19/19 - House Journal |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Approved by Governor 2/19/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Approved by Governor 2/19/19 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | To Governor 2/15/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-02-18 | House | To Governor 2/15/19 - House Journal |
2019-02-15 | Senate | To Governor 2/15/19 |
2019-02-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-07 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-02-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-07 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 90) |
2019-02-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 89) |
2019-02-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-07 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-05 | House | Immediate consideration |
2019-02-05 | House | Reference dispensed |
2019-02-05 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 68) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 68) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-04 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-01-31 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-01-16 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-16 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2528 (Similar To) 2019-02-08 - Tabled on 3rd reading, Special Calendar
HB2624 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - To House Agriculture and Natural Resources
HB2624 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - To House Agriculture and Natural Resources
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 1 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |