WV SB323 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 4, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 4, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing revenue fund and source to support Department of Agriculture's improvement to facilities
Title
Establishing revenue fund and source to support Department of Agriculture's improvement to facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 134) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 133) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 97) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 97) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 133) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 97) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 97) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 4, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-02-26 | House | Approved by Governor 2/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 2/25/19 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | To Governor 2/19/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-02-19 | Senate | To Governor 2/19/19 |
2019-02-19 | House | To Governor 2/19/19 - House Journal |
2019-02-14 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-13 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-02-13 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-13 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 134) |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 133) |
2019-02-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-13 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-12 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-11 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-11 | House | Immediate consideration |
2019-02-11 | House | Reference dispensed |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 97) |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 97) |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-06 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-01-30 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2019-01-16 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-16 | Senate | To Government Organization then Finance |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2468 (Similar To) 2019-02-13 - Tabled on 3rd reading, Special Calendar
SB385 (Similar To) 2019-01-21 - To Finance
SB385 (Similar To) 2019-01-21 - To Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 1 | 4e | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 12A | 6a | Amended Code | Citation Text |