WV SB318 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 138, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Transferring Medicaid Fraud Control Unit to Attorney General's office

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transferring Medicaid Fraud Control Unit to Attorney General's office

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - House - Effective October 1, 2019 (Roll No. 521) (Y: 73 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Effective July 1, 2021 rejected (Roll No. 520) (Y: 40 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 519) (Y: 58 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 496) (Y: 40 N: 58 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Effective October 1, 2019 (Roll No. 262) (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 262) (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateChapter 138, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-03-09HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-25SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/19
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-22SenateTo Governor 3/22/19
2019-03-08SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-07HouseCompleted legislative action
2019-03-07HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-07HouseEffective October 1, 2019 (Roll No. 521)
2019-03-07HouseEffective July 1, 2021 rejected (Roll No. 520)
2019-03-07HousePassed House (Roll No. 519)
2019-03-07HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-07HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-06HouseAmendment rejected (Roll No. 496)
2019-03-06HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-06HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-05HouseRead 1st time
2019-03-05HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-04HouseDo pass
2019-02-28HouseTo House Finance
2019-02-28HouseDo pass, but first to Finance
2019-02-28HouseTo House Health and Human Resources
2019-02-28HouseTo Health and Human Resources then Finance
2019-02-28HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-27SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-27SenateEffective October 1, 2019 (Roll No. 262)
2019-02-27SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 262)
2019-02-27SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-27SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-26SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-26SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-25SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-25SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-23SenateCommittee substitute reported
2019-01-16SenateTo Judiciary
2019-01-16SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-16SenateTo Judiciary
2019-01-16SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2867 (Similar To) 2019-02-08 - To House Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
971Amended CodeCitation Text
973Amended CodeCitation Text
976Amended CodeCitation Text
976aAmended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=318&year=2019&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB318%20INTR.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=318
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB318%20SUB1.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=318
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB318%20SUB1%20ENR.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=318
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/senate/02-27-0262.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00496.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00519.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00520.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00521.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback