WV SB316 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 62, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Preserving previously approved state Municipal Policemen's or Firemen's pensions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Preserving previously approved state Municipal Policemen's or Firemen's pensions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 368) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 368) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 463) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 453) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 215) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateChapter 62, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-03-09HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-25SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/19
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/20/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/20/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-20SenateTo Governor 3/20/19
2019-03-07HouseHouse received Senate message
2019-03-06SenateCompleted legislative action
2019-03-06SenateCommunicated to House
2019-03-06SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 368)
2019-03-06SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 368)
2019-03-06SenateSenate concurred in House title amendment (Voice vote)
2019-03-06SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-05HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-05HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 463)
2019-03-05HouseTaken up for further consideration
2019-03-05HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-05HousePassed House (Roll No. 453)
2019-03-05HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-05HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-04HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-04HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-02HouseRead 1st time
2019-03-02HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-01HouseWith title amendment, do pass
2019-02-27HouseTo House Finance
2019-02-27HouseDo pass, but first to Finance
2019-02-26HouseTo House Pensions and Retirement
2019-02-26HouseTo Pensions and Retirement then Finance
2019-02-26HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-25SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-25SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 215)
2019-02-25SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-25SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-23SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-23SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-22SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-22SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-21SenateCommittee substitute reported
2019-02-07SenateTo Finance
2019-02-07SenateReported do pass, but first to Finance
2019-01-16SenateTo Pensions
2019-01-16SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-16SenateTo Pensions then Finance
2019-01-16SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2409 (Similar To) 2019-01-15 - To House Pensions and Retirement

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
82227aAmended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback