WV SB306 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB306

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-17 - Ordered to House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Licensing of drivers utilizing bioptic telescopic devices

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Licensing of drivers utilizing bioptic telescopic devices

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 153) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-17SenateOrdered to House
2020-02-17SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 153)
2020-02-17SenateRead 3rd time
2020-02-17SenateOn 3rd reading
2020-02-14SenateRead 2nd time
2020-02-14SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-02-13SenateRead 1st time
2020-02-13SenateOn 1st reading
2020-02-12SenateCommittee substitute reported
2020-01-10SenateTo Transportation and Infrastructure
2020-01-10SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-01-10SenateTo Transportation and Infrastructure
2020-01-10SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB306 (Carry Over) 2019-01-15 - To Banking and Insurance

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
17B2B3Amended CodeCitation Text
17B2B4Amended CodeCitation Text
17B2B5Amended CodeCitation Text
17B2B7Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback