WV SB303 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB303

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 110, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Enacting Students' Right to Know Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacting Students' Right to Know Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-07 - House - Effective January 1, 2021 (Roll No. 755) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 754) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Effective January 1, 2021 (Roll No. 537) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 537) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Effective January 1, 2021 (Roll No. 563) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 562) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Effective January 1, 2021 (Roll No. 27) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 27) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-14SenateChapter 110, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
2020-03-07SenateApproved by Governor 3/24/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-24SenateApproved by Governor 3/24/20
2020-03-07HouseApproved by Governor 3/24/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07HouseTo Governor 3/19/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07SenateTo Governor 3/19/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-19SenateTo Governor 3/19/20
2020-03-07SenateHouse Message received
2020-03-07HouseCompleted legislative action
2020-03-07HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-03-07HouseEffective January 1, 2021 (Roll No. 755)
2020-03-07HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 754)
2020-03-07HouseHouse received Senate message
2020-03-07SenateSenate requests House to concur
2020-03-07SenateEffective January 1, 2021 (Roll No. 537)
2020-03-07SenateSenate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 537)
2020-03-07SenateHouse Message received
2020-03-05HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-03-05HouseEffective January 1, 2021 (Roll No. 563)
2020-03-05HousePassed House (Roll No. 562)
2020-03-05HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-05HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2020-03-04HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-03-04HouseCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-03-04HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-04HouseFrom House Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on Special Calendar
2020-03-03HouseFrom Special Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on House Calendar
2020-03-02HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-29HouseRead 1st time
2020-02-29HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-28HouseWith amendment, do pass
2020-01-28HouseTo House Education
2020-01-28HouseTo Education
2020-01-28HouseIntroduced in House
2020-01-27SenateOrdered to House
2020-01-27SenateEffective January 1, 2021 (Roll No. 27)
2020-01-27SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 27)
2020-01-27SenateRead 3rd time
2020-01-27SenateOn 3rd reading
2020-01-24SenateRead 2nd time
2020-01-24SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-01-23SenateRead 1st time
2020-01-23SenateOn 1st reading
2020-01-22SenateCommittee substitute reported
2020-01-10SenateTo Education
2020-01-10SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-01-10SenateTo Education
2020-01-10SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB303 (Carry Over) 2019-01-15 - To Finance

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1810P1New CodeSee Bill Text
1810P2New CodeSee Bill Text
1810P3New CodeSee Bill Text
1810P4New CodeSee Bill Text
1810P5New CodeSee Bill Text
1810P6New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=303&year=2020&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB303%20INTR.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=303
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB303%20SUB1.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=303
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB303%20SUB1%20ENR.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=303
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/senate/01-27-0027.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/house/00562.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/house/00563.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/senate/03-07-0537.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/house/00754.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/house/00755.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback