WV SB3026 | 2021 | 3rd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on October 15 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to review, approval, disapproval, or amendment of local boards of health rules by county commission or county board of education

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to review, approval, disapproval, or amendment of local boards of health rules by county commission or county board of education

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-10-15 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 830) (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 829) (Y: 81 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-15 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 828) (Y: 78 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-13 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 34) (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-10-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 34) (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-15SenateHouse Message received
2021-10-15HouseCompleted legislative action
2021-10-15HouseCommunicated to Senate
2021-10-15HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 830)
2021-10-15HousePassed House (Roll No. 829)
2021-10-15HouseRead 3rd time
2021-10-15HouseDispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 828)
2021-10-15HouseRead 2nd time
2021-10-15HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2021-10-14HouseRead 1st time
2021-10-14HouseImmediate consideration
2021-10-14HouseReference dispensed
2021-10-14HouseIntroduced in House
2021-10-13SenateOrdered to House
2021-10-13SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 34)
2021-10-13SenateFloor title amendment adopted
2021-10-13SenateCommittee title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent
2021-10-13SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 34)
2021-10-13SenateRead 3rd time
2021-10-13SenateFloor amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2021-10-13SenateCommittee amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent
2021-10-13SenateDeferred until foot of 3rd
2021-10-13SenateOn 3rd reading with right to amend, amendment pending
2021-10-12SenateRead 2nd time
2021-10-12SenateImmediate consideration
2021-10-12SenateReported do pass
2021-10-12SenateTo Finance
2021-10-12SenateReported do pass with amend and title amend but first to Finance
2021-10-12SenateOn 2nd reading to Judiciary then Finance
2021-10-12SenateOn 2nd reading
2021-10-11SenateRead 1st time
2021-10-11SenateCommittee reference dispensed
2021-10-11SenateImmediate consideration
2021-10-11SenateIntroduced in Senate
2021-10-11SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB331 (Similar To) 2021-10-11 - To House Health and Human Resources

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16211Amended CodeCitation Text
16213Amended CodeCitation Text
1622Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=3026&year=2021&sessiontype=3X&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB3026%20INTR.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=3X&i=3026
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB3026%20ENG.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=3X&i=3026
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB3026%20ENR.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=3X&i=3026
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/3X/com_amends/SB3026%20S%20JUD%20AMT%20_1%2010-12.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/3X/com_amends/SB3026%20S%20JUD%20AM%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/3X/floor_amends/SB3026%20SFA%20TRUMP%20_2%2010-13.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/3X/floor_amends/SB3026%20SFAT%20_1%20TRUMP%2010-13.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/3X/floor_amends/SB3026%20SFA%20TRUMP%20_1%2010-13%20pulled.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/3X/votes/senate/10-13-0034.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/3X/votes/house/00828.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/3X/votes/house/00829.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/3X/votes/house/00830.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback