WV SB3025 | 2021 | 3rd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on October 15 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating generally to WV ABLE Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating generally to WV ABLE Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-10-15 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 37) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-15 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 37) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-14 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 812) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 811) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-14 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 763) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-13 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 27) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 27) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-15SenateCompleted legislative action
2021-10-15SenateCommunicated to House
2021-10-15SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 37)
2021-10-15SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 37)
2021-10-15SenateHouse Message received
2021-10-14HouseCommunicated to Senate
2021-10-14HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 812)
2021-10-14HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2021-10-14HousePassed House (Roll No. 811)
2021-10-14HouseRead 3rd time
2021-10-14HouseDispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 763)
2021-10-14HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2021-10-14HouseRead 2nd time
2021-10-14HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2021-10-13HouseRead 1st time
2021-10-13HouseImmediate consideration
2021-10-13HouseReference dispensed
2021-10-13HouseIntroduced in House
2021-10-13SenateOrdered to House
2021-10-13SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 27)
2021-10-13SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 27)
2021-10-13SenateRead 3rd time
2021-10-13SenateOn 3rd reading
2021-10-12SenateRead 2nd time
2021-10-12SenateOn 2nd reading
2021-10-11SenateRead 1st time
2021-10-11SenateCommittee reference dispensed
2021-10-11SenateImmediate consideration
2021-10-11SenateIntroduced in Senate
2021-10-11SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB328 (Similar To) 2021-10-15 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16483Amended CodeCitation Text
16484Amended CodeCitation Text
16486Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=3025&year=2021&sessiontype=3X&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB3025%20INTR.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=3X&i=3025
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB3025%20ENR.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=3X&i=3025
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/3X/floor_amends/SB3025%20HFAT%20HOUSEHOLDER%2010-14%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/3X/floor_amends/SB3025%20HFAT%20HOUSEHOLDER%2010-13%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/3X/floor_amends/SB3025%20HFA%20HOUSEHOLDER%2010-14.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/3X/votes/senate/10-13-0027.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/3X/votes/house/00763.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/3X/votes/house/00811.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/3X/votes/house/00812.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/3X/votes/senate/10-15-0037.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback