WV SB3024 | 2021 | 3rd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on October 14 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-10-18 - To Governor 10/18/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Supplementing and amending Title II, section 12, Budget Bill, for fiscal year ending June 30, 2022

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supplementing and amending Title II, section 12, Budget Bill, for fiscal year ending June 30, 2022

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-10-14 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 810) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 809) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-14 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 763) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-13 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 26) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 26) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-18SenateTo Governor 10/18/21
2021-10-15SenateHouse Message received
2021-10-14HouseCompleted legislative action
2021-10-14HouseCommunicated to Senate
2021-10-14HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 810)
2021-10-14HousePassed House (Roll No. 809)
2021-10-14HouseRead 3rd time
2021-10-14HouseDispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 763)
2021-10-14HouseRead 2nd time
2021-10-14HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2021-10-13HouseRead 1st time
2021-10-13HouseImmediate consideration
2021-10-13HouseReference dispensed
2021-10-13HouseIntroduced in House
2021-10-13SenateOrdered to House
2021-10-13SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 26)
2021-10-13SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 26)
2021-10-13SenateRead 3rd time
2021-10-13SenateOn 3rd reading
2021-10-12SenateRead 2nd time
2021-10-12SenateOn 2nd reading
2021-10-11SenateRead 1st time
2021-10-11SenateCommittee reference dispensed
2021-10-11SenateImmediate consideration
2021-10-11SenateIntroduced in Senate
2021-10-11SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB326 (Similar To) 2021-10-15 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar

Subjects


West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback