WV SB302 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-25 - Referred to Rules on 1st reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to authorize a child sexual abuse and sexual violence prevention program and in-service training in child sexual abuse prevention.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing child sexual abuse and sexual violence prevention program and in-service training in child sexual abuse prevention

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-25SenateReferred to Rules on 1st reading
2024-01-25SenateOn 1st reading
2024-01-24SenateCommittee substitute reported
2024-01-12SenateTo Education
2024-01-12SenateIntroduced in Senate
2024-01-11SenateTo Education
2024-01-12SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18241Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback