WV SB3015 | 2021 | 3rd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - Chapter 16, Acts, 3rd Extraordinary Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - Chapter 16, Acts, 3rd Extraordinary Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Making supplemental appropriation of federal funds to Commission for National and Community Service
Title
Making supplemental appropriation of federal funds to Commission for National and Community Service
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-14 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 793) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 792) (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-14 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 763) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-13 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 17) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 17) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 792) (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-14 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 763) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-13 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 17) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 17) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-03 | Senate | Chapter 16, Acts, 3rd Extraordinary Session, 2021 |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Approved by Governor 10-22-21 - Senate Journal |
2021-10-22 | Senate | Approved by Governor 10-22-21 |
2021-10-20 | House | Approved by Governor 10/22/21 - House Journal |
2021-10-20 | House | To Governor 10/18/21 - House Journal |
2021-10-18 | Senate | To Governor 10/18/21 |
2021-10-15 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-10-14 | House | Completed legislative action |
2021-10-14 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-10-14 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 793) |
2021-10-14 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 792) |
2021-10-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-10-14 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 763) |
2021-10-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-10-14 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-10-13 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-10-13 | House | Immediate consideration |
2021-10-13 | House | Reference dispensed |
2021-10-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 17) |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 17) |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-10-13 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-10-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-10-12 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-10-11 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-10-11 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2021-10-11 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2021-10-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-10-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB317 (Similar To) 2021-10-20 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar