WV SB3001 | 2022 | 3rd Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-29 - Communicated to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-29 - Communicated to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to family planning services
Title
Relating to family planning services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-07-29 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 767) (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2022-07-29 - House - Effective January 1, 2023 (Roll No. 766) (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2022-07-29 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 765) (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2022-07-29 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No. 764) (Y: 73 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2022-07-29 - House - Amendment to amendment adopted (Roll No. 763) (Y: 40 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2022-07-29 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 762) (Y: 8 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
2022-07-29 - House - Amendment to amendment adopted (Roll No. 761) (Y: 63 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2022-07-29 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 760) (Y: 14 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
2022-07-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-07-26 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 2) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-07-29 - House - Effective January 1, 2023 (Roll No. 766) (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2022-07-29 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 765) (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2022-07-29 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No. 764) (Y: 73 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2022-07-29 - House - Amendment to amendment adopted (Roll No. 763) (Y: 40 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2022-07-29 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 762) (Y: 8 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
2022-07-29 - House - Amendment to amendment adopted (Roll No. 761) (Y: 63 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2022-07-29 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 760) (Y: 14 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
2022-07-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-07-26 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 2) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-29 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-07-29 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-07-29 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 767) |
2022-07-29 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-07-29 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-07-29 | House | House reconsidered passage (Voice) |
2022-07-29 | House | House reconsidered title amendment |
2022-07-29 | House | House reconsidered effective date |
2022-07-29 | House | Motion to reconsider |
2022-07-29 | House | Effective January 1, 2023 (Roll No. 766) |
2022-07-29 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-07-29 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 765) |
2022-07-29 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-07-29 | House | Amendment adopted (Roll No. 764) |
2022-07-29 | House | Amendment to amendment adopted (Voice) |
2022-07-29 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2022-07-29 | House | Amendment to amendment adopted (Voice) |
2022-07-29 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2022-07-29 | House | Amendment to amendment adopted (Voice) |
2022-07-29 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2022-07-29 | House | Amendment to amendment adopted (Roll No. 763) |
2022-07-29 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2022-07-29 | House | Amendment to amendment adopted (Voice) |
2022-07-29 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2022-07-29 | House | Amendment to amendment adopted (Voice) |
2022-07-29 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2022-07-29 | House | Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 762) |
2022-07-29 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2022-07-29 | House | Amendment to amendment rejected |
2022-07-29 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2022-07-29 | House | Amendment to amendment adopted (Roll No. 761) |
2022-07-29 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2022-07-29 | House | Amendment withdrawn (Voice vote) |
2022-07-29 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2022-07-29 | House | Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 760) |
2022-07-29 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2022-07-29 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar |
2022-07-28 | House | Amendments pending |
2022-07-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-07-28 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-07-27 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-07-27 | House | Immediate consideration |
2022-07-27 | House | Reference dispensed |
2022-07-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-07-27 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2022-07-27 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2023 (Roll No. 3) |
2022-07-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) |
2022-07-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-07-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-07-26 | Senate | Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 2) |
2022-07-26 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-07-26 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2022-07-26 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2022-07-26 | Senate | Originating in Senate Finance |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 21 | 10a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 58 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 58 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 58 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 58 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 5K | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 15 | 4x | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 16 | 3ww | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 24 | 7x | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 24 | 8u | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 25A | 8x | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 16 | 7h | New Code | See Bill Text |