WV SB300 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-23 - To House Energy
Pending: House Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-23 - To House Energy
Pending: House Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creating five-year tax credits for businesses locating on post-coal mine sites
Title
Creating five-year tax credits for businesses locating on post-coal mine sites
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 14) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-23 | House | To House Energy |
2018-01-23 | House | To Energy then Finance |
2018-01-23 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 14) |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-01-22 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 1/18/18 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-01-17 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Originating in Senate Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SB12 (Similar To) 2018-01-10 - To Economic Development
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 28 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 28 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 28 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |