WV SB30 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 142, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 142, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminating tax on annuity considerations collected by life insurer
Title
Eliminating tax on annuity considerations collected by life insurer
Sponsors
Sen. Craig Blair [R] | Sen. Sue Cline [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 517) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 579) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 93) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 579) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 93) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 142, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/20/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/20/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-20 | Senate | To Governor 3/20/19 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 517) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 579) |
2019-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-03-06 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-05 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2019-03-01 | House | To House Finance |
2019-03-01 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2019-02-11 | House | To House Banking and Insurance |
2019-02-11 | House | To Banking and Insurance then Finance |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 93) |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-06 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2019-01-29 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment, but first to Finance |
2019-01-09 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-09 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance then Finance |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2400 (Similar To) 2019-01-14 - To House Banking and Insurance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 3 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |