WV SB3 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 42, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing WV Small Wireless Facilities Deployment Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing WV Small Wireless Facilities Deployment Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 338) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 338) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 423) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 422) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 15) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 15) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateChapter 42, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-03-09SenateApproved by Governor 3/27/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-27SenateApproved by Governor 3/27/19
2019-03-09HouseApproved by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/20/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/20/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-20SenateTo Governor 3/20/19
2019-03-05HouseHouse received Senate message
2019-03-05SenateCompleted legislative action
2019-03-05SenateCommunicated to House
2019-03-05SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 338)
2019-03-05SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 338)
2019-03-05SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-04HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-04HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 423)
2019-03-04HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-04HousePassed House (Roll No. 422)
2019-03-04HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-04HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-04HouseCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-02HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-02HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-01HouseRead 1st time
2019-03-01HouseImmediate consideration
2019-03-01HouseWith amendment, do pass
2019-02-26HouseTo House Judiciary
2019-02-26HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary
2019-01-23HouseTo House Technology and Infrastructure
2019-01-23HouseTo Technology and Infrastructure then Judiciary
2019-01-23HouseIntroduced in House
2019-01-22SenateOrdered to House
2019-01-22SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 15)
2019-01-22SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 15)
2019-01-22SenateRead 3rd time
2019-01-22SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-01-21SenateFloor amendments adopted (Voice vote)
2019-01-21SenateRead 2nd time
2019-01-18SenateLaid over on 2nd reading 1/18/19
2019-01-18SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-01-17SenateRead 1st time
2019-01-17SenateOn 1st reading
2019-01-16SenateCommittee substitute reported
2019-01-09SenateTo Government Organization
2019-01-09SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-09SenateTo Government Organization
2019-01-09SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
116L1New CodeSee Bill Text
116L2New CodeSee Bill Text
116L3New CodeSee Bill Text
116L4New CodeSee Bill Text
116L5New CodeSee Bill Text
31G44New CodeSee Bill Text
31G45New CodeSee Bill Text
31G46New CodeSee Bill Text
31H11New CodeSee Bill Text
31H12New CodeSee Bill Text
31H21New CodeSee Bill Text
31H22New CodeSee Bill Text
31H23New CodeSee Bill Text
31H24New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=3&year=2019&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB3%20INTR.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=3
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB3%20SUB1.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=3
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB3%20SUB1%20ENG.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=3
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB3%20SUB1%20ENR.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=3
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/senate/01-22-0015.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00422.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00423.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/senate/03-05-0338.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback