WV SB298 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 206, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 206, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to clarify that the members deposit fund, the employers accumulation fund, the retirement reserve fund, the income fund and the expense fund all refer to the Public Employees Retirement Fund.
Title
Clarifying funds within Public Employees Retirement Fund
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Gaunch [R] | Sen. Charles Trump [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 125) (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 124) (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 2) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 124) (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 2) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Senate | Chapter 206, Acts, Regular Session, 2015 |
2015-03-05 | House | Approved by Governor 3/3/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/3/15 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/3/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-02-28 | House | To Governor 2/27/15 - House Journal |
2015-02-27 | Senate | To Governor 2/27/15 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-02-20 | House | Completed legislative action |
2015-02-20 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 125) |
2015-02-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-20 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 124) |
2015-02-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-20 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-19 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-02-19 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-18 | House | Do pass |
2015-02-16 | House | To House Finance |
2015-02-16 | House | To Finance |
2015-02-16 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 2) |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-13 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-12 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-02-11 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2015-02-05 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2015-01-26 | Senate | To Pensions |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-01-26 | Senate | To Pensions then Judiciary |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2504 (Same As) 2015-02-06 - To House Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 10 | 28 | Amended Code | Citation Text |