WV SB297 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-24 - To House Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-24 - To House Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring Board of Education create home economics course
Title
Requiring Board of Education create family and consumer sciences course
Sponsors
Sen. Sue Cline [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-23 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 19) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-24 | House | To House Education |
2020-01-27 | House | To Education then Finance |
2020-01-24 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 19) |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-01-23 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 1/21/20 |
2020-01-21 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-01-20 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-01-17 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2020-01-10 | Senate | To Education |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-10 | Senate | To Education then Finance |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |