WV SB297 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-02 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extending expiration of military members' spouses' driver's license

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extending expiration of military members' spouses' driver's license

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 47) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-02HouseTo House Finance
2019-03-02HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Finance
2019-02-01HouseTo House Technology and Infrastructure
2019-02-01HouseTo Technology and Infrastructure then Finance
2019-02-01HouseIntroduced in House
2019-01-31SenateOrdered to House
2019-01-31SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 47)
2019-01-31SenateReported by clerk
2019-01-30SenateLaid over on 3rd reading 1/30/19
2019-01-30SenateRead 3rd time
2019-01-30SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-01-29SenateRead 2nd time
2019-01-29SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-01-28SenateRead 1st time
2019-01-28SenateOn 1st reading
2019-01-25SenateReported do pass
2019-01-16SenateTo Finance
2019-01-16SenateReported do pass, but first to Finance
2019-01-14SenateTo Military
2019-01-14SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-14SenateTo Military then Finance
2019-01-14SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2784 (Similar To) 2019-01-31 - To House Technology and Infrastructure

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
17B212Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback