WV SB295 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 73, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to crimes against public justice

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to crimes against public justice

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-09 - House - House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 717) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 515) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 399) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 149) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateChapter 73, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-03-09SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-25SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/19
2019-03-09HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/20/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/20/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-20SenateTo Governor 3/20/19
2019-03-09SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-09HouseCompleted legislative action
2019-03-09HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-09HouseHouse adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 717)
2019-03-09HouseConference report received-House
2019-03-09HouseHouse received Senate message
2019-03-09SenateSenate requests House to concur
2019-03-09SenateSenate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 515)
2019-03-08SenateConference report filed - Senate
2019-03-08HouseConference report filed - House
2019-03-07HouseHouse received Senate message
2019-03-06SenateTo conference
2019-03-06SenateCommunicated to House
2019-03-06SenateSenate agreed to conference and appoints conferees: Trump, Cline, Lindsay
2019-03-06SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-05HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-05HouseHouse appointed conferees: Hollen, Kelly, D., Miller
2019-03-05HouseHouse refused to recede and requested conference(Voice vote)
2019-03-05HouseHouse received Senate message
2019-03-02SenateCommunicated to House
2019-03-02SenateSenate refused to concur; requested House recede(Voice vote)
2019-03-02SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-01HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-01HousePassed House (Roll No. 399)
2019-03-01HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-01HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-28HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-02-28HouseRead 2nd time
2019-02-28HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-27HousePostponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/28/19
2019-02-27HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-26HouseRead 1st time
2019-02-26HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-25HouseDo pass
2019-02-19HouseTo House Judiciary
2019-02-19HouseTo Judiciary
2019-02-19HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-18SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 149)
2019-02-18SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-18SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-15SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-15SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-14SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-14SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-13SenateCommittee substitute reported
2019-01-14SenateTo Judiciary
2019-01-14SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-14SenateTo Judiciary
2019-01-14SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB3000 (Similar To) 2019-02-12 - To House Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51319New CodeSee Bill Text
61517Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback