WV SB293 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-23 - To House Government Organization
Pending: House Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-23 - To House Government Organization
Pending: House Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifying that Economic Development Authority is not authorized to enter into banking contracts without State Treasurer approval
Title
Clarifying that Economic Development Authority is not authorized to enter into banking contracts without State Treasurer approval
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 22) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | House | To House Government Organization |
2021-02-23 | House | To Government Organization |
2021-02-23 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 22) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-02-22 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-02-19 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2021-02-13 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2021-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-02-13 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2021-02-13 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
31 | 15 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
31 | 15 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |