WV SB292 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-25 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-25 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to Commission on Special Investigations
Title
Relating to Commission on Special Investigations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 20) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-25 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-01-25 | House | To Judiciary |
2018-01-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 20) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-01-24 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-01-23 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-01-22 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2018-01-16 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-01-16 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
4 | 5 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
4 | 5 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
4 | 5 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
4 | 5 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
4 | 5 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
4 | 5 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
4 | 5 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |