WV SB291 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-08 - Chapter 52, Acts, Regular Session, 2008
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-08 - Chapter 52, Acts, Regular Session, 2008
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize the Governor to appoint an additional judge to the twenty-second Judicial Circuit consisting of Pendleton County, Hardy County and Hampshire County to alleviate case load.
Title
Appointing additional circuit court judge to Pendleton, Hardy, Hampshire, Mercer and Wayne counties
Sponsors
Sen. Walt Helmick [D] | Sen. John Yoder [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-08 | Chapter 52, Acts, Regular Session, 2008 | |
2008-03-16 | Approved by Governor 4/1/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-04-01 | Approved by Governor 4/1/08 | |
2008-03-16 | Approved by Governor 4/1/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/21/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-21 | To Governor 3/21/08 | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/21/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-08 | House Message received | |
2008-03-07 | Completed legislative action | |
2008-03-07 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-03-07 | Passed House (Roll No. 416) | |
2008-03-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-03-07 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-03-06 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-03-06 | From House Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2008-03-05 | Read 1st time | |
2008-03-05 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-03-05 | Do pass | |
2008-03-05 | To House Finance | |
2008-03-05 | Do pass, but first to Finance | |
2008-02-26 | To House Judiciary | |
2008-02-26 | To Judiciary then Finance | |
2008-02-26 | Introduced in House | |
2008-02-25 | Ordered to House | |
2008-02-25 | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 8) | |
2008-02-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-02-25 | On 3rd reading | |
2008-02-22 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-02-22 | On 2nd reading | |
2008-02-21 | Read 1st time | |
2008-02-21 | On 1st reading | |
2008-02-20 | Reported do pass, with title amendment | |
2008-02-14 | To Finance | |
2008-02-14 | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance | |
2008-01-22 | To Judiciary | |
2008-01-22 | To Judiciary then Finance | |
2008-01-22 | Introduced in Senate | |
2008-01-22 | To Judiciary then Finance | |
2008-01-22 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=291&year=2008&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |