WV SB290 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 85, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 85, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to DEP standards of water quality and effluent limitations
Title
Relating to DEP standards of water quality and effluent limitations
Sponsors
Sen. Randy Smith [R] | Sen. Mike Azinger [R] | Sen. Gregory Boso [R] | Sen. Charles Clements [R] |
Sen. Sue Cline [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 401) (Y: 88 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 105) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 105) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | Chapter 85, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-19 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/19/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-08 | House | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 401) |
2018-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-03-06 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-05 | House | Do pass |
2018-02-14 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-02-14 | House | To Judiciary |
2018-02-14 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 105) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 2/12/18 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-12 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-09 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-02-08 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2018-01-22 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2018-01-16 | Senate | To Energy, Industry and Mining |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-01-16 | Senate | To Energy, Industry and Mining then Judiciary |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4426 (Similar To) 2018-02-05 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 11 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |