WV SB29 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - To House Small Business, Entrepreneurship and Economic Development
Pending: House Small Business, Entrepreneurship and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Creating five-year tax credits for businesses on post-coal mine sites

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating ten-year tax credits for businesses locating on post-coal mine sites

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 161) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19HouseTo House Small Business, Entrepreneurship and Economic Development
2019-02-19HouseTo Small Business, Entrepreneurship and Economic Development then Finance
2019-02-19HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-19SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-19SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 161)
2019-02-19SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-19SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-18SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-18SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-15SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-15SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-14SenateCommittee substitute reported
2019-01-17SenateTo Finance
2019-01-17SenateReported do pass, with amendments, but first to Finance
2019-01-09SenateTo Economic Development
2019-01-09SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-09SenateTo Economic Development then Finance
2019-01-09SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11281New CodeSee Bill Text
11282New CodeSee Bill Text
11283New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback