WV SB29 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - To House Small Business, Entrepreneurship and Economic Development
Pending: House Small Business, Entrepreneurship and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - To House Small Business, Entrepreneurship and Economic Development
Pending: House Small Business, Entrepreneurship and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creating five-year tax credits for businesses on post-coal mine sites
Title
Creating ten-year tax credits for businesses locating on post-coal mine sites
Sponsors
Sen. Craig Blair [R] | Sen. Robert Plymale [D] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. Gregory Boso [R] |
Sen. Glenn Jeffries [D] | Sen. Chandler Swope [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 161) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | To House Small Business, Entrepreneurship and Economic Development |
2019-02-19 | House | To Small Business, Entrepreneurship and Economic Development then Finance |
2019-02-19 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 161) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-19 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-18 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-15 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2019-01-17 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendments, but first to Finance |
2019-01-09 | Senate | To Economic Development |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-09 | Senate | To Economic Development then Finance |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 28 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 28 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 28 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |