WV SB286 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill concerns visitation rights of grandparents. The bill defines a term.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to grandparents' visitation rights

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-29 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 301) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-30HouseTo House Judiciary
2017-03-30HouseTo Judiciary
2017-03-30HouseIntroduced in House
2017-03-29SenateOrdered to House
2017-03-29SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 301)
2017-03-29SenateDeferred until foot of 2nd
2017-03-29SenateRead 3rd time
2017-03-29SenateOn 3rd reading
2017-03-28SenateRead 2nd time
2017-03-28SenateOn 2nd reading
2017-03-27SenateRead 1st time
2017-03-27SenateImmediate consideration
2017-03-27SenateCommittee substitute reported
2017-02-14SenateTo Judiciary
2017-02-14SenateIntroduced in Senate
2017-02-14SenateTo Judiciary
2017-02-14SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2547 (Similar To) 2017-02-20 - To House Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4810502Amended CodeCitation Text
4810802New CodeSee Bill Text
4810803New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback