WV SB285 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 3, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to modification of cottage food laws

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to sale of homemade food items

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 388) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 487) (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 127) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateChapter 3, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-03-09SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-25SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/19
2019-03-09HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/19/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/19/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-19SenateTo Governor 3/19/19
2019-03-07SenateCompleted legislative action
2019-03-07SenateCommunicated to House
2019-03-07SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 388)
2019-03-07SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-06HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-06HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-06HousePassed House (Roll No. 487)
2019-03-06HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-06HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-05HouseCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-05HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-05HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-04HouseRead 1st time
2019-03-04HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-02HouseWith amendment, do pass
2019-02-28HouseTo House Judiciary
2019-02-28HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary
2019-02-14HouseTo House Agriculture and Natural Resources
2019-02-14HouseTo Agriculture and Natural Resources then Judiciary
2019-02-14HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-13SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-13SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 127)
2019-02-13SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-13SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-12SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-12SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-11SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-11SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-08SenateCommittee substitute for committee substitute reported
2019-01-25SenateTo Government Organization
2019-01-25SenateCommittee substitute reported, but first to Government Organization
2019-01-14SenateTo Agriculture and Rural Development
2019-01-14SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-14SenateTo Agriculture and Rural Development then Government Organization
2019-01-14SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2564 (Similar To) 2019-01-21 - To House Agriculture and Natural Resources

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
19352Amended CodeCitation Text
19355Amended CodeCitation Text
19356New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=285&year=2019&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB285%20INTR.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=285
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB285%20SUB1.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=285
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB285%20SUB2.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=285
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB285%20SUB2%20ENR.htm&yr=2019&sesstype=RS&i=285
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/senate/02-13-0127.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/house/00487.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2019/RS/votes/senate/03-07-0388.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback